VT S0010 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Signed by Governor on june 2, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Signed by Governor on june 2, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to liability for the contamination of potable water supplies
Title
An act relating to liability for the contamination of potable water supplies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 140, Nays = 2 (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor on june 2, 2017 |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 6/2/17 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on 5/30/17 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-05-03 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Deen of Westminster moved to postpone action until May 3, 2017 which was agreed to |
2017-05-01 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Bray |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Bray; text |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-28 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-04-26 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-25 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 140, Nays = 2 |
2017-04-25 | House | Report of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife agreed to. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rep. Deen of Westminster reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife |
2017-04-25 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Campion for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-02-08 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onNatural Resources and Energy |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |