VT S0005 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 1, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 1, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to plea agreements
Title
An act relating to plea agreements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 1, 2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 1, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-04-11 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence |
2017-04-07 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-06 | House | Rep. Willhoit of St. Johnsbury reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-06 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-04-05 | House | Rep. Willhoit of St. Johnsbury moved to postpone action until April 6, 2017 which was agreed to |
2017-01-26 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-01-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-01-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-19 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |