VT S0004 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Signed by Governor on 6/5/17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to publicly accessible meetings of an accountable care organization’s governing body

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to publicly accessible meetings of an accountable care organization’s governing body

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-05SenateSigned by Governor on 6/5/17
2017-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor on 5/30/17
2017-05-02SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-05-02HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2017-05-02SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2017-05-02SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2017-05-02SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2017-05-02SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-05-01SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2017-05-01SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-28HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-04-28HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-04-27HouseRecommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Health Care agreed to
2017-04-27HouseRep. Jickling of Brookfield reported for the committee on Health Care
2017-04-27HouseRead Second Time
2017-03-29HouseRep. Townsend of South Burlington moved that the committee on Government Operations be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Health Care which was agreed to.
2017-03-28HouseRep. Pugh of South Burlington moved that the committee on Human Services be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Government Operations which was agreed to.
2017-03-22HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services
2017-03-17SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-03-17SenatePending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Lyons
2017-03-17SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-03-16Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-03-16SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
2017-03-16SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare
2017-03-16SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2017-03-16SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-03-15SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare
2017-01-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback