VT S0001 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Signed by Governor on March 1, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the determination of average daily membership for the 2016–2017 school year and equalized pupil count for fiscal year 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the determination of average daily membership for the 2016–2017 school year and equalized pupil count for fiscal year 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-03 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 52, Nays = 83 (Y: 52 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 47, Nays = 87 (Y: 47 N: 87 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-01SenateSigned by Governor on March 1, 2017
2017-02-23SenateDelivered to Governor on February 23, 2017
2017-02-03SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-02-03SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence
2017-02-03HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-02-03HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence
2017-02-03HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 52, Nays = 83
2017-02-03HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury disagreed to
2017-02-03HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 68 of 134 to Pass -- Yeas = 47, Nays = 87
2017-02-03HouseRep. Beck of St. Johnsbury asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2017-02-03HouseRep. Beck of St. Johnsbury moved to substitute an amendment
2017-02-03HouseWhich was disagreed to
2017-02-03HouseRep. Wright of Burlington raised a Point of Order
2017-02-03HouseRep. Poirier of Barre City moved to amend the House proposal of amendment.
2017-02-02HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-02-02HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-02HouseRep. Wright of Burlington recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2017-02-02HouseRep. Cupoli of Rutland City reported for the committee on Education
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2017-01-27HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education
2017-01-25SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-01-25SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-01-24SenateReported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2017-01-24SenateReported favorably by Senator Bray for Committee on Education
2017-01-24SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-24SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2017-01-24SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-01-20SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-20SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2017-01-18SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2017-01-18SenateFavorable report by Committee on Education
2017-01-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Education

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback