VT JRS047 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Rep. Olsen of Jamaica moved to commit bill to the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs which was agreed to.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - Rep. Olsen of Jamaica moved to commit bill to the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs which was agreed to.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Urging The United States Postal Service Not To Implement Its Proposed Major Reductions And Urging Congress To Enact The Postal Service Protection Act
Title
Joint Resolution Urging The United States Postal Service Not To Implement Its Proposed Major Reductions And Urging Congress To Enact The Postal Service Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Ashe [D] | Sen. John Campbell [D] | Sen. William Carris [D] | Sen. William Doyle [R] |
Sen. Vincent Illuzzi [R] | Sen. Richard McCormack [D] | Sen. Alice Nitka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Rep. Olsen of Jamaica moved to commit bill to the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs which was agreed to. | |
2012-02-22 | Read First Time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 | |
2012-02-21 | Adopted by Senate | |
2012-02-21 | Unfinished Business/Joint Resolutions for Adoption | |
2012-02-17 | Unfinished Business/Joint Resolutions for Adoption | |
2012-02-16 | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption | |
2012-02-14 | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.vt.us/database/status/summary.cfm?Bill=JRS047&Session=2012 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.vt.us/docs/2012/resolutn/JRS047.pdf |