VT JRS047 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-12 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Strongly Urging The Republic Of Turkey To Recognize The Right To Religious Freedom For All Its Residents And To End All Discriminatory Policies Directed Against The Ecumenical Patriarchate Of The Orthodox Church

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Strongly Urging The Republic Of Turkey To Recognize The Right To Religious Freedom For All Its Residents And To End All Discriminatory Policies Directed Against The Ecumenical Patriarchate Of The Orthodox Church

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-12 As adopted by Senate and House
2010-05-12 House proposal of amendment concurred in
2010-05-12 House proposal of amendment; text
2010-05-12 House Proposal of Amendment
2010-05-11 House Proposal of Amendment
2010-05-08 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-08 Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2010-05-08 Read Third time
2010-05-08 Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-08 Third Reading Ordered
2010-05-08 Amendment as offered by Rep. Kitzmiller of Montpelier agreed to
2010-05-08 Read Second Time
2010-05-07 Rules not suspended
2010-05-05 Committed to Committee on Commerce and Economic Development by motion of Rep. Head of South Burlington
2010-04-15 Read First time, treated as a bill and referred to committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
2010-04-14 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-04-14 Read 3rd time & adopted
2010-04-14 New Business/Third Reading
2010-04-13 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 1
2010-04-13 Reported favorably by Senator Illuzzi for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-04-13 Read 2nd time
2010-04-13 Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-04-13 Consideration postponed; Second reading
2010-04-09 Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-04-09 Second Reading
2010-04-09 Consideration postponed to Tuesday, April 13, 2010
2010-04-08 Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-04-08 Second Reading
2010-04-08 Consideration postponed to April 13, 2010
2010-04-07 Consideration postponed to April 13, 2010 on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-04-07 Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-04-07 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2010-04-06 Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-04-06 New Business/Second Reading
2010-04-02 Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-04-02 Second Reading
2010-02-09 Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs per Rule 51
2010-02-09 Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs per Rule 51

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback