VT JRS025 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 27 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 27 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution authorizing the Commissioner of Forests, Parks and Recreation to amend conservation easements related to the former Hancock Lands and adjacent Averill Inholdings in Essex County, to sell the Bertha Tract in Mendon and the Burch Tract in Killington to the Trust for Public Lands, to authorize the Commissioner to amend the Department of Forests, Parks and Recreation’s existing lease with the Smuggler’s Notch Management Company Ltd. and to authorize the Department to enter into a land eand exchange with the Smuggler’s Notch Management Company Ltd
Title
Joint resolution authorizing the Commissioner of Forests, Parks and Recreation to amend conservation easements related to the former Hancock Lands and adjacent Averill Inholdings in Essex County, to sell the Bertha Tract in Mendon and the Burch Tract in Killington to the Trust for Public Lands, to authorize the Commissioner to amend the Department of Forests, Parks and Recreation’s existing lease with the Smuggler’s Notch Management Company Ltd. and to authorize the Department to enter into a land eand exchange with the Smuggler’s Notch Management Company Ltd
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-04-27 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2017-04-27 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2017-04-27 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-04-25 | House | Adopted in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-04-25 | House | Read Third time |
2017-04-21 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-21 | House | Report of Committee on Corrections and Institutions agreed to. |
2017-04-21 | House | Rep. Belaski of Windsor spoke for the committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2017-04-21 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-04-05 | House | Rep. Macaig of Williston moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Corrections and Institutions which was agreed to. |
2017-04-04 | House | Read first time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time & adopted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |