VT JRS024 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution relating to amending temporary Joint Rule 22A and to public access to the State House or other legislative meeting spaces
Title
Joint resolution relating to amending temporary Joint Rule 22A and to public access to the State House or other legislative meeting spaces
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-21 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2021-05-20 | House | Rules suspended and resolution messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-05-20 | House | Adopted in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-20 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield reported for the Committee on Rules |
2021-05-20 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-05-04 | House | Rep. Long of Newfane moved to commit the resolution to the Committee on Rules, which was agreed to |
2021-04-29 | House | Rep. Long of Newfane moved to postpone action until May 4, 2021 which was agreed to |
2021-04-28 | House | Rep. Long of Newfane moved to postpone action until April 29, 2021 which was agreed to |
2021-04-22 | House | Rep. Long of Newfane moved to postpone action until April 28, 2021 which was agreed to |
2021-04-21 | House | Read and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 33 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Adopted on the part of the Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on Notice Calendar per Rule 34 |