VT JRS021 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution providing for a Joint Assembly to vote on the retention of a Chief Justice and three Justices of the Supreme Court and ten Superior Court Judges
Title
Joint resolution providing for a Joint Assembly to vote on the retention of a Chief Justice and three Justices of the Supreme Court and ten Superior Court Judges
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Nitka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2017-03-03 | Senate | House message House adopted in concurrence |
2017-03-03 | House | Adopted in Concurrence |
2017-03-02 | House | Read first time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Adopted by Senate |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2017-03-01 | Senate | SenatorAshe moved to amend |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ashe |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Joint Resolutions for Adoption |
2017-02-28 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |