VT JRS021 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment
Title
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2015-03-27 | Senate | House message House adopted in concurrence |
2015-03-26 | House | Adopted in Concurrence |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Adopted by Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |