VT JRS019 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - Read First time, treated as a bill, and referred to committee on Health Care
Pending: House Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - Read First time, treated as a bill, and referred to committee on Health Care
Pending: House Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution relating to prescription drug pricing
Title
Joint resolution relating to prescription drug pricing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | Read First time, treated as a bill, and referred to committee on Health Care |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time & adopted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2017-02-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Health and Welfare per Rule 51 |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2018/J.R.S.19 |
Text | http://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2018/Docs/RESOLUTN/JRS019/JRS019%20As%20Introduced.pdf |