VT JRS018 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Adopted on the part of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Adopted on the part of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution providing for a Joint Assembly to vote on the retention of two Superior Judges and three Magistrates
Title
Joint resolution providing for a Joint Assembly to vote on the retention of two Superior Judges and three Magistrates
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Nitka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Adopted on the part of the Senate |
2021-03-12 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2021-03-12 | Senate | House message: House adopted in concurrence |
2021-03-12 | House | Adopted in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | House | Read First time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |