VT JRS017 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Read First time, treated as a bill, and referred to committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Read First time, treated as a bill, and referred to committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution rescinding the General Assembly’s request, contained in 2014 Acts and Resolves No. R-454, for Congress to convene a U.S. Constitutional Convention
Title
Joint resolution rescinding the General Assembly’s request, contained in 2014 Acts and Resolves No. R-454, for Congress to convene a U.S. Constitutional Convention
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Pearson [D] | Sen. Claire Ayer [D] | Sen. Joseph Benning [R] | Sen. Alison Clarkson [D] |
Sen. Michael Sirotkin [D] | Sen. Jeanette White [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 7 (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Read First time, treated as a bill, and referred to committee on Government Operations |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Division 9-20, as requested by Senator Sears |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Motion disagreed to |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Point of order sustained by the President |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Point of order raised by Senator(s) Degree |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senator Sears motion to order bill to lie |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 7 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee on Judiciary relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Sears |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Judiciary per Rule 51 |