VT JRS017 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Providing For A Joint Assembly To Vote On The Retention Of Seven Superior Judges And One Magistrate
Title
Joint Resolution Providing For A Joint Assembly To Vote On The Retention Of Seven Superior Judges And One Magistrate
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Nitka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House message House adopted in concurrence |
2013-03-14 | House | Adopted in Concurrence |
2013-03-13 | House | Read First Time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Adopted by Senate |
2013-03-12 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |