VT JRH026 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Ordered to lie on motion of Senator Campbell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Ordered to lie on motion of Senator Campbell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution relating to the amendment of the federal Toxic Substances Control Act and its preemption provisions
Title
Joint resolution relating to the amendment of the federal Toxic Substances Control Act and its preemption provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Ordered to lie on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Pending question: Shall bill be amended as recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy? |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Consideration postponed; Second reading |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Campion |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Campion for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2016-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy on motion of Senator Bray |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-04-23 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Energy per Rule 51 |
2016-04-13 | House | Passed |
2016-04-13 | House | Read Third time |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-04-12 | House | Report of Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources agreed to. |
2016-04-12 | House | Rep. Deen of Westminster reported for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |
2016-04-12 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-04-01 | House | Read First time, treated as a bill and referred to committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2016/J.R.H.26 |
Text | http://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2016/Docs/RESOLUTN/JRH026/JRH026%20As%20Introduced.pdf |