VT JRH006 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Senate Message, adopted in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Joint resolution relating to racism as a public health emergency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint resolution relating to racism as a public health emergency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 106 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 42 (Y: 99 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 135, Nays = 8 (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseSenate Message, adopted in concurrence
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-05-20SenateRead 3rd time & adopted in concurrence
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably by Senator Hardy for Committee on Health and Welfare, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2021-05-20SenateFavorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare
2021-05-20SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2021-05-19SenateFavorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare
2021-05-19SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-05-18SenateReferred to Committee on Health and Welfare per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
2021-05-14SenateRead 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Rules per Rule 51
2021-05-12HouseMotion to suspend rules as moved by Rep. Colburn of Burlington disagreed to
2021-05-12HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 106 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 42
2021-05-12HouseRep. Colburn of Burlington demanded yeas and nays
2021-05-12HouseRep Colburn of Burlington moved to suspend rules and message actions to the Senate forthwith
2021-05-12HouseAdopted
2021-05-12HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 135, Nays = 8
2021-05-12HouseRep. Pugh of South Burlington demanded yeas and nays
2021-05-12HouseRead Third time
2021-05-11HouseThird Reading ordered
2021-05-11HouseRep. Small of Winooski reported for the Committee on Human Services
2021-05-11HouseRead Second time
2021-03-16HouseRead First time, treated as a bill, and referred to the Committee on Human Services

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback