VT HCR237 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 123-54-3)
Status: Passed on February 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-10 - Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 123-54-3)
Status: Passed on February 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-10 - Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
House Concurrent Resolution Congratulating All Vermonters Competing For The United States In The 2010 Olympics In British Columbia
Title
House Concurrent Resolution Congratulating All Vermonters Competing For The United States In The 2010 Olympics In British Columbia
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b | |
2010-02-10 | House Concurrent Resolution for Adoption in Concurrence | |
2010-02-09 | House Concurrent Resolution for Adoption in Concurrence | |
2010-02-09 | House Concurrent Resolution for Adoption in Concurrence | |
2010-02-09 | Adopted in concurrence pursuant to Joint Rule 16b | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 2/5/2010 | |
2010-02-05 | House Concurrent Resolution for Adoption in Concurrence |