VT HCR211 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Ceremonial Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Ceremonial Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House concurrent resolution designating April 11, 2024 as Tourism Economy Day at the State House
Title
House concurrent resolution designating April 11, 2024 as Tourism Economy Day at the State House
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Ceremonial Reading |
2024-04-05 | House | Adopted pursuant to Joint Rule 16b |
2024-04-05 | House | Senate Message: Adopted in concurrence |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b |
2024-04-05 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2024-04-04 | House | On Consent Calendar |