VT HCR191 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Ceremonial Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Ceremonial Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House concurrent resolution recognizing March 25, 2024 as National Medal of Honor Day in Vermont
Title
House concurrent resolution recognizing March 25, 2024 as National Medal of Honor Day in Vermont
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Ceremonial Reading |
2024-03-22 | House | Adopted pursuant to Joint Rule 16b |
2024-03-22 | House | Senate Message: Adopted in concurrence |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b |
2024-03-22 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2024-03-21 | House | On Consent Calendar |