VT HCR164 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Ceremonial Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Ceremonial Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House concurrent resolution recognizing April 2024 as the Month of the Military Child in Vermont
Title
House concurrent resolution recognizing April 2024 as the Month of the Military Child in Vermont
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Ceremonial Reading |
2024-04-02 | House | Ceremonial Reading |
2024-03-01 | House | Adopted pursuant to Joint Rule 16b |
2024-03-01 | House | Senate Message, adopted in concurrence |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b |
2024-03-01 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | On Consent Calendar |