VT HCR158 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Ceremonial Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Ceremonial Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House concurrent resolution designating February 22, 2024 as Age Strong Vermont Day at the State House
Title
House concurrent resolution designating February 22, 2024 as Age Strong Vermont Day at the State House
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Ceremonial Reading |
2024-02-16 | House | Senate Message, adopted in concurrence |
2024-02-16 | House | Adopted pursuant to Joint Rule 16b |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b |
2024-02-16 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | On Consent Calendar |