VT H0969 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - House message: Governor approved bill on October 2, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - House message: Governor approved bill on October 2, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to making appropriations for the support of government
Title
An act relating to making appropriations for the support of government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-25 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 141, Nays = 5 (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Starr, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-11 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 100, Nays = 42 (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 140, Nays = 4 (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Starr, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-11 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 100, Nays = 42 (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 140, Nays = 4 (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on October 2, 2020 |
2020-10-02 | House | Signed by Governor on October 2, 2020 |
2020-09-29 | House | Delivered to the Governor on September 29, 2020 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2020-09-25 | House | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney. |
2020-09-25 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 141, Nays = 5 |
2020-09-25 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2020-09-25 | House | Rep. Toll of Danville demanded yeas and nays |
2020-09-25 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-09-25 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Starr, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Kitchel for Committee, text |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Kitchel, Ashe, and Westman |
2020-09-23 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2020-09-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-09-22 | House | Speaker appointed Toll of Danville, Hooper of Montpelier and Fagan of Rutland City as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2020-09-22 | House | Which was agreed to |
2020-09-22 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Toll of Danville |
2020-09-18 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-09-18 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-09-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-09-18 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Clarkson, Brock, Hooker, Sirotkin, and Westman |
2020-09-18 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Balint, Lyons, and Ingram |
2020-09-18 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Kitchel, Nitka, Sears, Starr, McCormack, Westman, and Ashe |
2020-09-18 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Cummings, Brock, MacDonald, and Sirotkin |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-11 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-09-11 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2020-09-11 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield agreed to |
2020-09-11 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Harrison of Chittenden agreed to |
2020-09-11 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 100, Nays = 42 |
2020-09-11 | House | Rep. McCoy of Poultney demanded yeas and nays |
2020-09-11 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Briglin of Thetford agreed to |
2020-09-11 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Higley of Lowell agreed to |
2020-09-11 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Hooper of Montpelier agreed to |
2020-09-10 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-09-10 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 140, Nays = 4 |
2020-09-10 | House | Rep. Toll of Danville demanded yeas and nays |
2020-09-10 | House | Rep. Toll of Danville spoke for the committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-10 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-09-10 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-09-10 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on September 10, 2020 |