VT H0966 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - House message: Governor approved bill on July 2, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to COVID-19 funding and assistance for broadband connectivity, housing, and economic relief

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to COVID-19 funding and assistance for broadband connectivity, housing, and economic relief

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on July 2, 2020
2020-07-02HouseSigned by Governor on July 2, 2020
2020-06-26SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2020-06-30HouseDelivered to the Governor on June 30, 2020
2020-06-26HouseRules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney.
2020-06-26HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2020-06-26HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-06-26HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2020-06-26SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-06-26SenatePending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Sirotkin, Balint, Brock, Clarkson, and Hooker
2020-06-26SenatePending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Kitchel
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-06-26Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0
2020-06-26SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
2020-06-26SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-06-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-19HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-06-19HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 143, Nays = 1
2020-06-19HouseRep. Feltus of Lyndon demanded yeas and nays
2020-06-19HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-06-19HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Marcotte of Coventry, Bancroft of Westford, Carroll of Bennington, Dickinson of St. Albans Town, Jerome of Brandon, Kimbell of Woodstock, Morris of Springfield, O'Sullivan of Burlington, Ralph of Hartland, and Toleno of Brattleboro agreed to
2020-06-19HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Pugh of South Burlington, Brumsted of Shelburne, Gregoire of Fairfield, Haas of Rochester, McFaun of Barre Town, Nicoll of Ludlow, Noyes of Wolcott, Pajala of Londonderry, Redmond of Essex, Rosenquist of Georgia, and Wood of Waterbury agreed to
2020-06-18HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-06-18HouseRep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2020-06-18HouseRead Second Time
2020-06-17HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on June 17, 2020

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback