VT H0955 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Signed by Governor on July 6, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to capital construction and State bonding budget adjustment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to capital construction and State bonding budget adjustment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06HouseSigned by Governor on July 6, 2020
2020-06-30HouseDelivered to the Governor on June 30, 2020
2020-06-26SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2020-06-25HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2020-06-25HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-06-24HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-06-24SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-06-24SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2020-06-24SenateSenator(s) Benning motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2020-06-23Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-06-24SenatePending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Benning
2020-06-24SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-06-23SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Institutions, as amended, agreed to
2020-06-23SenateRecommendation of amendment agreed to
2020-06-23SenateRecommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Hardy, Balint, Clarkson, Ingram, and McCormack, text
2020-06-23SenateSenator Balint requested & granted leave to abstain from voting pursuant to Senate Rules 69 & 71
2020-06-23SenateReported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-23SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Institutions
2020-06-23SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Hardy, Clarkson, Ingram, and McCormack
2020-06-23SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-23SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions
2020-06-23SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-06-22SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Hardy, Clarkson, Ingram, and McCormack
2020-06-22SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2020-06-22SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions
2020-06-22SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-06-17SenateRules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Institutions intact, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-06-17SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-05-28SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions
2020-05-27HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-05-27HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-05-22HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-05-22HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Emmons of Springfield agreed to
2020-05-22HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield agreed to
2020-05-22HouseRep. Emmons of Springfield spoke for the committee on Corrections and Institutions
2020-05-22HouseRead Second Time
2020-05-15HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2020-05-15HouseCommittee Bill read first time

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback