VT H0926 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 17 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Delivered to the Governor on September 29, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to changes to Act 250

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to changes to Act 250

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-25 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 75 of 148 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 97 (Y: 51 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-09-25 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 75 of 149 to Pass -- Yeas = 93, Nays = 56 (Y: 93 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 3 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Committee on Natural Resources and Energy Secs 1-7 and 12 proposal of amendment agreed to on roll call requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Committee on Natural Resources and Energy Secs 8-11 proposal of amendment agreed to on roll call requested by Senator Parent, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 6 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 88, Nays = 52 (Y: 88 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 45, Nays = 96 (Y: 45 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 43, Nays = 93 (Y: 43 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29HouseDelivered to the Governor on September 29, 2020
2020-09-25HouseRules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney.
2020-09-25HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 75 of 149 to Pass -- Yeas = 93, Nays = 56
2020-09-25HouseRep. LaClair of Barre Town demanded yeas and nays
2020-09-25HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2020-09-25HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 75 of 148 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 97
2020-09-25HouseWhich was disagreed to
2020-09-25HouseRep. Harrison of Chittenden demanded yeas and nays
2020-09-25HouseRep. Higley of Lowell, Feltus of Lyndon, Gregoire of Fairfield, Hango of Berkshire, Martel of Waterford, and Page of Newport City moved that the House concur in the Senate proposal of amendment with a further amendment thereto
2020-09-25HouseWhich was disagreed to
2020-09-25HouseRep. Lefebvre of Newark moved that the House concur in the Senate proposal of amendment with a further amendment thereto
2020-09-17SenateRules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-09-17SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 3
2020-09-17HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-09-17SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Benning
2020-09-17SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-09-16Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-09-16SenateCommittee on Natural Resources and Energy Secs 1-7 and 12 proposal of amendment agreed to on roll call requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2020-09-16SenateCommittee on Natural Resources and Energy Secs 8-11 proposal of amendment agreed to on roll call requested by Senator Parent, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 6
2020-09-16SenateRoll Call, demanded by Sen. Parent, Yeas 22, Nays 8
2020-09-16SenateSenator Bray motion to vote first on Secs. 8-11 of Natural Resources and Energy proposal agreed to
2020-09-16SenateQuestion divided on demand of Senator Parent
2020-09-16SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2020-09-16SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2020-09-16SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-09-15SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2020-09-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-09-11SenateCommittee on Finance relieved of further consideration of the bill on motion of Senator Cummings
2020-09-11SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2020-09-11SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2020-09-11SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-09-03SenateCommittee on Finance relieved; bill committed to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy on motion of Senator Cummings
2020-06-25SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2020-06-25SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2020-06-25SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-03-11SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2020-02-28HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-02-28HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 88, Nays = 52
2020-02-28HouseRep. Bock of Chester demanded yeas and nays
2020-02-28HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 45, Nays = 96
2020-02-28HouseRep. Burditt of West Rutland demanded yeas and nays
2020-02-28HouseRep. Bock of Chester moved to postpone action until March 10, 2020 which was disagreed to
2020-02-28HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Scheuermann of Stowe agreed to
2020-02-28HouseRep. Scheuermann of Stowe asked permission to offer an amendment after third reading, which was agreed to.
2020-02-28HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Harrison of Chittenden, Brownell of Pownal, Gannon of Wilmington, and Sibilia of Dover agreed to
2020-02-28HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Lefebvre of Newark agreed to
2020-02-27HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-02-27HouseReport of Committee on Appropriations as amended agreed to
2020-02-27HouseWhich was disagreed to
2020-02-27HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 43, Nays = 93
2020-02-27HouseRep. Brennan of Colchester demanded yeas and nays
2020-02-27HouseRep. Brennan of Colchester moved to recommit the bill to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife.
2020-02-27HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Sheldon of Middlebury agreed to
2020-02-27HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Dolan of Waitsfield agreed to
2020-02-27HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Dolan of Waitsfield and McCullough of Williston agreed to
2020-02-27HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2020-02-27HouseReport of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to.
2020-02-27HouseRep. Ancel of Calais recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2020-02-27HouseRep. Dolan of Waitsfield reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife
2020-02-27HouseRead Second Time
2020-02-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2020-02-14HouseCommittee Bill read first time

Vermont State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2020/H.926
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2020/Docs/BILLS/H-0926/H-0926%20As%20Introduced.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2020/Docs/BILLS/H-0926/H-0926%20As%20passed%20by%20the%20House%20Official.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2020/Docs/BILLS/H-0926/H-0926%20As%20Passed%20by%20Both%20House%20and%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/141
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/142
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/143
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/225
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/226
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/228
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/238
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2020/240

Bill Comments

feedback