VT H0926 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Colchester
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Colchester
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Bill Requested by Governor, Delivered on May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2018-05-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-04-19 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-04-18 | House | Rep. Lewis of Berlin reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-18 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-04-05 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |