VT H0925 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the City of Barre
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the City of Barre
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Poirier [I] | Rep. Tommy Walz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Bill Requested by Governor, Delivered on May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-04 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2018-05-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-04-10 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-04-06 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2018-04-06 | House | Rep. Wright of Burlington recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2018-04-06 | House | Rep. Lewis of Berlin reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-06 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2018-03-28 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |