VT H0922 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to making numerous revenue changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to making numerous revenue changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2018-05-11SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Soucy, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 5
2018-05-11SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-05-10Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-05-10SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Brock,  Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 25, Nays = 5
2018-05-10SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Finance, as amended, agreed to
2018-05-10SenateProposal of amendment not agreed to
2018-05-10SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Brock; text
2018-05-10SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Brock,  Failed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 6, Nays = 24
2018-05-10SenateProposal of amendment not agreed to
2018-05-10SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Brock; text
2018-05-10SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Finance amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-10SenateReported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
2018-05-10SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance
2018-05-10SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Brock
2018-05-10SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-10SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2018-05-10SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-05-09SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2018-05-09SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-09SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-07SenateRules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Finance intact, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-03-27SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
2018-03-22HousePassed
2018-03-22HouseRead Third time
2018-03-22HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-03-22HouseRep. Young of Glover moved to amend the bill
2018-03-22HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2018-03-22HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
2018-03-21HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-03-21HouseRep. Young of Glover spoke for the committee on Ways and Means
2018-03-21HouseRead Second Time
2018-03-20HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 20, 2018

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback