VT H0913 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-12 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-12 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to boards and commissions
Title
An act relating to boards and commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-12 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Ayer for Committee, text |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Ayer, Clarkson, and Pearson |
2018-05-11 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2018-05-11 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-11 | House | Speaker appointed Gannon of Wilmington, LaClair of Barre Town and Gardner of Richmond as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2018-05-11 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Gannon of Wilmington |
2018-05-11 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Pearson and White |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senator Pearson and White moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2018-05-10 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White, Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, and Pearson |
2018-05-10 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment, with further proposal of amendment |
2018-05-08 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Gannon of Wilmington |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-05-07 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Gannon of Wilmington |
2018-05-04 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senator(s) Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, Pearson, and White motion to amend Committee on Government Operations proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senator(s) White motion to amend Committee on Government Operations proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-21 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-03-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-03-20 | House | Rep. Dakin of Colchester recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-20 | House | Rep. Gannon of Wilmington spoke for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2018-03-13 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 13, 2018 |