VT H0911 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor on May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor on May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to changes in Vermont’s personal income tax and education financing system
Title
An act relating to changes in Vermont’s personal income tax and education financing system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-12 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 67 of 132 to Pass -- Yeas = 89, Nays = 43 (Y: 89 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 3 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 85, Nays = 54 (Y: 85 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 90 (Y: 51 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 44, Nays = 92 (Y: 44 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 3 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 85, Nays = 54 (Y: 85 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 90 (Y: 51 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 44, Nays = 92 (Y: 44 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Vetoed by the Governor on May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2018-05-12 | House | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton. |
2018-05-12 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2018-05-12 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 67 of 132 to Pass -- Yeas = 89, Nays = 43 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-12 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-12 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Cummings for Committee, text |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2018-05-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Cummings, MacDonald, and Brock |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2018-05-08 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-08 | House | Speaker appointed Ancel of Calais, Sharpe of Bristol and Beck of St. Johnsbury as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Ancel of Calais |
2018-05-08 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-07 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-05 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-04 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 3 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Pending question: Shall bill be amended as recommended by Committee on Finance? |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed |
2018-03-21 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 85, Nays = 54 |
2018-03-21 | House | Read Third time |
2018-03-21 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-03-21 | House | Rep. LaClair of Barre Town moved to amend the bill |
2018-03-21 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-03-21 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 90 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rep. Scheuermann of Stowe moved to amend the bill |
2018-03-21 | House | Rep. Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2018-03-21 | House | Rep. Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs moved to amend the bill |
2018-03-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-03-20 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-03-20 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 44, Nays = 92 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rep. Sibilia of Dover and Gannon of Wilmington moved to amend the bill |
2018-03-20 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2018-03-20 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell moved to amend the bill |
2018-03-20 | House | Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2018-03-20 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-03-20 | House | Rep. Ancel of Calais moved to amend the bill |
2018-03-20 | House | Rep. Juskiewicz of Cambridge recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-20 | House | Rep. Sharpe of Bristol reported for the committee on Education |
2018-03-20 | House | Rep. Ancel of Calais spoke for the committee on Ways and Means |
2018-03-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2018-03-02 | House | Rep. Krowinski of Burlington moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Education which was agreed to. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rep. Savage of Swanton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2018-03-02 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 2, 2018 |