VT H0908 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Administrative Procedure Act
Title
An act relating to the Administrative Procedure Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2018-05-10 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-05-09 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Kitzmiller of Montpelier |
2018-05-09 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) White, Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, and Pearson |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senator White, Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, and Pearson moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White, Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, and Pearson |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White, Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, and Pearson |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-07 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-05 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-04 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Townsend of South Burlington, Brumsted of Shelburne, Devereux of Mount Holly, Gannon of Wilmington, Gardner of Richmond, Harrison of Chittenden, LaClair of Barre Town, Lewis of Berlin, and Weed of Enosburgh |
2018-05-04 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-05-04 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-03 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-14 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-03-13 | House | Rep. Kitzmiller of Montpelier spoke for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-13 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-03-02 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 2, 2018 |