VT H0901 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to expanding access to adult technical education equipment funding

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to expanding access to adult technical education equipment funding

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Education
2020-03-13HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-03-13HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-03-13HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-03-13HouseReport of Committee on Corrections and Institutions agreed to.
2020-03-13HouseRep. Leffler of Enosburgh reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions
2020-03-13HouseRead Second Time
2020-03-10HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2020-01-23HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback