VT H0899 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to a town fee report and request
Title
An act relating to a town fee report and request
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2018-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-05-04 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Campion for Committee on Finance |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-22 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-03-21 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-03-21 | House | Report of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to. |
2018-03-21 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2018-03-21 | House | Rep. Gannon of Wilmington spoke for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-21 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on February 23, 2018 |