VT H0884 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Signed by Governor on 5/17/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Signed by Governor on 5/17/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the City of Barre
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the City of Barre
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Walz [D] | Rep. Paul Poirier [I] | Rep. Robert Laclair [R] | Rep. Francis McFaun [R] |
Rep. Gabrielle Lucke [D] | Rep. Mary Morrissey [R] | Rep. Thomas Stevens [D] | Rep. Job Tate [R] |
Rep. Diana Gonzalez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/17/16 |
2016-05-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 5/16/16 |
2016-05-05 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Pollina |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-04-19 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2016-04-15 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-04-15 | House | Rep. Lewis of Berlin reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2016-04-15 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-04-07 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |