VT H0882 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to capital construction and State bonding budget adjustment
Title
An act relating to capital construction and State bonding budget adjustment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2024-04-30 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions |
2024-04-03 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-04-03 | House | Rep. Cina of Burlington moved to amend the bill, which was disagreed to |
2024-04-03 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-04-02 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-02 | House | Rep. Emmons of Springfield spoke for the Committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2024-04-02 | House | Read second time |
2024-04-02 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2024-03-29 | House | Rep. Emmons of Springfield moved to postpone action until 4/02/2024, which was agreed to |
2024-03-29 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2024-03-28 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2024-03-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-03-26 | House | Committee bill read first time |