VT H0880 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions
Pending: Senate Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to Abenaki place names on State park signs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to Abenaki place names on State park signs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions
2020-06-25HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-06-25HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-06-25HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-06-25HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-06-25HouseReport of Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs agreed to.
2020-06-25HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Stevens of Waterbury agreed to
2020-06-25HouseRep. Howard of Rutland City reported for the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
2020-06-25HouseRead Second Time
2020-06-03HouseAction postponed until June 12, 2020 as moved by Rep. Stevens of Waterbury
2020-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar for Notice on 3/13/2020
2020-01-22HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback