VT H0876 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by Governor on 6/2/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by Governor on 6/2/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the transportation capital program and miscellaneous changes to transportation-related law
Title
An act relating to the transportation capital program and miscellaneous changes to transportation-related law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 12 of 23 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 0 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 124, Nays = 19 (Y: 124 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 124, Nays = 19 (Y: 124 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | House | Signed by Governor on 6/2/16 |
2016-06-01 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 6/1/16 |
2016-05-06 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Mazza for Committee, text |
2016-05-06 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-06 | House | Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill) |
2016-05-06 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-05-06 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2016-05-05 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2016-05-03 | House | Speaker appointed Brennan of Colchester, Corcoran of Bennington and Burke of Brattleboro as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Mazza, Westman, and Flory |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-05-02 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2016-05-02 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2016-05-02 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Brennan of Colchester and Corcoran of Bennington |
2016-05-02 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2016-04-29 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 12 of 23 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 0 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Westman, Degree, Flory, Kitchel, and Mazza; text |
2016-04-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation, as amended, agreed to |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Mazza for Committee on Transportation |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Westman, Degree, Flory, Kitchel, and Mazza |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2016-04-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Transportation intact, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-03-30 | House | Passed |
2016-03-30 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 124, Nays = 19 |
2016-03-30 | House | Read Third time |
2016-03-30 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-03-30 | House | Rep. Hooper of Montpelier moved to amend the bill |
2016-03-30 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-03-30 | House | Rep. Krebs of South Hero moved to amend the bill |
2016-03-29 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-03-29 | House | Rep. Rep. Helm of Fair Haven, recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-29 | House | Rep. Rep. Brennan of Colchester spoke for the committee on Transportation |
2016-03-29 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-03-29 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-03-29 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2016-03-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2016-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/24/16 |
2016-03-23 | House | Committee Bill read first time |