VT H0874 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 10, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Consent For Admission To Hospice Care And For Dnr/colst Orders
Title
An Act Relating To Consent For Admission To Hospice Care And For Dnr/colst Orders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 10, 2014 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-04-29 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-04-24 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Lyons and Flory |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons and Flory |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2014-04-22 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-04-18 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-04-18 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2014-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-04-18 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-04-18 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed |
2014-03-20 | House | Read Third time |
2014-03-19 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-19 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield spoke for the committee on Human Services |
2014-03-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on March 18, 2014 |