VT H0873 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Making Technical Amendments To Tax Increment Financing Laws
Title
An Act Relating To Making Technical Amendments To Tax Increment Financing Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed |
2014-03-19 | House | Read Third time |
2014-03-18 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-18 | House | Rep. Condon of Colchester spoke for the committee on Ways and Means |
2014-03-18 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on March 14, 2014 |