VT H0864 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on June 9, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on June 9, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Capital Construction And State Bonding Budget Adjustment
Title
An Act Relating To Capital Construction And State Bonding Budget Adjustment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on June 9, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-08 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Rodgers; text |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senator(s) Rodgers requested & granted leave to offer amendment after third reading |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Pending Question: On reconsideration, shall the bill pass in concurrence with proposals of amendment? |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Consideration postponed to May 6, 2014 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Consideration postponed May 6, 2014 |
2014-05-03 | Senate | Consideration postponed Tuesday, May 6, 2014 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Consideration postponed to Tuesday, May 6, 2014 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Consideration Postponed/Third Reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Consideration postponed to Tuesday, May 6, 2014 on motion of Senator Flory |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Motion by Senator Flory to suspend Rule 73 to allow reconsideration of previous vote taken |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions, as amended, agreed to |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Flory for Committee on Institutions |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions |
2014-02-28 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2014-02-27 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-02-27 | House | Rep. Winters of Williamstown reported for the committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-26 | House | Rep. Rep. Emmons of Springfield spoke for the committee on Corrections and Institutions |
2014-02-27 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee Bill read first time |