VT H0863 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 14, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 14, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Records
Title
An Act Relating To Public Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 14, 2014 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-04-29 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-04-25 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) White moved to amend bill |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Consideration resumed |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Consideration Postponed/Third Reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator White |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Motion by Senator White to reconsider vote on passage in concurrence agreed to |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2014-04-22 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ayer for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2014-04-18 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-04-18 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2014-02-27 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-02-26 | House | Rep. Cole of Burlington spoke for the committee on Government Operations |
2014-02-26 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on February 25, 2014 |