VT H0856 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to medical leave for a serious injury
Title
An act relating to medical leave for a serious injury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2024-03-15 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-15 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-14 | House | Report of Committee on General and Housing agreed to |
2024-03-14 | House | Rep. Labor of Morgan reported for the Committee on General and Housing |
2024-03-14 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-14 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-13 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-03-12 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 03/13/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-01 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-02-14 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on General and Housing |