VT H0837 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-4-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Delivered to the Governor on July 7, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to enhanced life estate deeds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to enhanced life estate deeds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on July 7, 2020
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-06-26HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2020-06-26SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Balint
2020-06-26SenateReported favorably by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint
2020-06-26SenateFavorable report by Committee on Judiciary
2020-06-26SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-03-24SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-13HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-03-13HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-03-13HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-03-13HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2020-03-13HouseRep. Seymour of Sutton reported for the committee on Judiciary
2020-03-13HouseRead Second Time
2020-02-27HouseRep. Seymour of Sutton moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Appropriations which was agreed to.
2020-02-27HouseRep. Seymour of Sutton reported for the committee on Judiciary
2020-02-27HouseRead Second Time
2020-01-22HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback