VT H0836 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to electronic court filings for relief from abuse orders
Title
An act relating to electronic court filings for relief from abuse orders
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Grad [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Signed by Governor on April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-04-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-04-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2018-04-11 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-04-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-06 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-05 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Willhoit of St. Johnsbury and Grad of Moretown |
2018-04-05 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-04-04 | House | Rep. Colburn of Burlington moved to postpone action until Thursday, April 5, 2018 which was agreed to |
2018-03-30 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed |
2018-03-01 | House | Read Third time |
2018-02-28 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-28 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rep. Colburn of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-28 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-01 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |