VT H0795 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - House message: Governor approved bill on October 5, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - House message: Governor approved bill on October 5, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to increasing hospital price transparency, hospital sustainability planning, provider sustainability and reimbursements, and regulators' access to information
Title
An act relating to increasing hospital price transparency, hospital sustainability planning, provider sustainability and reimbursements, and regulators' access to information
Sponsors
Rep. Lucy Rogers [D] | Rep. Annmarie Christensen [D] | Rep. Mari Cordes [D] | Rep. Anne Donahue [R] |
Rep. Lori Houghton [D] | Rep. Woodman Page [R] | Rep. Brian Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-05 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on October 5, 2020 |
2020-10-05 | House | Signed by Governor on October 5, 2020 |
2020-09-30 | House | Delivered to the Governor on September 30, 2020 |
2020-09-24 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2020-09-22 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Lyons, Ingram, McCormack, and Westman motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2020-09-17 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-09-17 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2020-09-16 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2020-09-16 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Committee on Government Operations relieved; bill committed to Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator White |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2020-03-13 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-03-13 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2020-03-12 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-03-12 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to. |
2020-03-12 | House | Rep. Rogers of Waterville reported for the committee on Health Care |
2020-03-12 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-01-21 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |