VT H0794 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to services provided by the Vermont Veterans’ Home
Title
An act relating to services provided by the Vermont Veterans’ Home
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2024-03-20 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-20 | House | Rep. Hooper of Burlington moved to amend the bill, which was agreed to |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-03-19 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-19 | House | Rep. Page of Newport City recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-19 | House | Rep. Hooper of Burlington reported for the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |
2024-03-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2024-03-15 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-02-14 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2024-01-16 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |