VT H0794 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-05 - Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-05 - Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Management Of Search And Rescue Operations
Title
An Act Relating To The Management Of Search And Rescue Operations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-05-05 | Rules suspended | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-02 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Illuzzi agreed to | |
2012-05-02 | Motion to substitute amendment agreed to | |
2012-05-02 | Senator(s) Illuzzi motion to substitute proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-05-02 | Called Up | |
2012-05-01 | Called up by Illuzzi | |
2012-05-01 | Roll Call, requested by Senator Campbell, Failed -- Needed 11 of 21 to Pass -- Yeas = 14, Nays = 7 | |
2012-05-01 | Senator Campbell moved to suspend rules to take bill up for immediate consideration - not agreed to on a roll call | |
2012-04-28 | Ordered to lie on motion of Senator Illuzzi | |
2012-04-28 | Consideration postponed on motion of Senator Illuzzi | |
2012-04-28 | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Ashe and Sears | |
2012-04-28 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi | |
2012-04-28 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-27 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-27 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to | |
2012-04-27 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ashe for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-27 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-27 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-27 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-27 | Committee on Appropriations relieved; bill committed to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs on motion of Senator Kitchel | |
2012-04-25 | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Appropriations on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-04-23 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-04-20 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-20 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-04-20 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Howard of Cambridge agreed to | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-19 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Jewett of Ripton agreed to | |
2012-04-18 | Rep. Rep. Jewett of Ripton spoke for the committee on Government Operations | |
2012-04-19 | Read Second Time | |
2012-04-17 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 4/17/2012 |