VT H0790 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on June 18, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on June 18, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Reach Up, Reach Ahead, And The Enhanced Child Care Services Subsidy Program
Title
An Act Relating To Reach Up, Reach Ahead, And The Enhanced Child Care Services Subsidy Program
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Pugh [D] | Rep. Anne Donahue [R] | Rep. Michael Fisher [D] | Rep. William Frank [D] |
Rep. Patsy French [D] | Rep. Sandy Haas [D] | Rep. Jill Krowinski [D] | Rep. Michael Mrowicki [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-21 - House - Shall the bill be amended as reccomended by the committee of Human Services? (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on June 18, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | House | Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill) |
2014-05-10 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Ayer for Committee, text |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Ayer, Nitka, and Lyons |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2014-05-07 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2014-05-07 | House | Speaker appointed Trieber of Rockingham, Pugh of South Burlington and O'Brien of Richmond as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Trieber of Rockingham |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-02 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senator(s) Kitchel motion to substitute amendment for Committee on Appropriations recommendation of amendment; text |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-25 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2014-03-21 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-21 | House | Amendment of Committee on Human Services agreed to |
2014-03-21 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 141, Nays = 4 |
2014-03-21 | House | Rep. O'Brien of Richmond reported for the committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-21 | House | Rep. Trieber of Rockingham reported for the committee on Human Services |
2014-03-21 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2014-03-18 | House | Rep. O'Brien of Richmond moved that the committee on Appropriations be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Human Services which was agreed to. |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2014-01-31 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |