VT H0790 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/7/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/7/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Approval Of Amendments To The Charter Of The Town Of Hartford
Title
An Act Relating To Approval Of Amendments To The Charter Of The Town Of Hartford
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/7/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/7/2012 | |
2012-05-01 | Reported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-05-01 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2012-05-02 | Passed the House and Senate on 5/2/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-01 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-05-01 | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-04-26 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-04-25 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-25 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-04-25 | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-25 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-25 | Rep. Rep. Hubert of Milton reported for the committee on Government Operations | |
2012-04-25 | Read Second Time | |
2012-04-25 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-05 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |