VT H0780 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/11/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/11/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Compensation For Certain State Employees
Title
An Act Relating To Compensation For Certain State Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/11/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/9/2012 | |
2012-05-04 | House message House adopted Conference Committee report | |
2012-05-03 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-03 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2012-05-03 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Flory for Committee, text | |
2012-05-03 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Flory, Nitka, and White | |
2012-05-04 | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton. | |
2012-05-04 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-04 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill) | |
2012-04-30 | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-28 | Speaker appointed Atkins of Winooski, Devereux of Mount Holly and Martin of Wolcott as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2012-04-28 | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Atkins of Winooski | |
2012-04-28 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-04-28 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sears agreed to | |
2012-04-28 | Consideration resumed | |
2012-04-28 | Consideration postponed on motion of Senator Sears | |
2012-04-28 | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Sears motion to amend proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-28 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-27 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-27 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to | |
2012-04-27 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-27 | First & Second proposals of amendment of Appropriations severally agreed to | |
2012-04-27 | Question on Appropriation proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi divided on request of Senator White | |
2012-04-27 | Reported favorably by Senator Illuzzi for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-27 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-04-27 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-26 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-25 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-24 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-23 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-19 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 | |
2012-04-17 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-04-17 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-29 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-03-28 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-03-28 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 135, Nays = 3 | |
2012-03-28 | Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Read Third time | |
2012-03-27 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-28 | Report of Committee on Appropriations agreed to. | |
2012-03-23 | Rep. Rep. Winters of Williamstown reported for the committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-23 | Rep. Rep. Atkins of Winooski spoke for the committee on Government Operations | |
2012-03-27 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-21 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) | |
2012-03-20 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/20/2012 |